CALDERDALE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the distress and suffering experienced by women who have been subjected to violence by partners or ex-partners and of the children of such women. To promote the safety of women and their children. and their protection from further violence. To promote the improvement of services to such women and their children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Calderdale
Governance
- 22 January 2001: Standard registration
- 12 February 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.01k | £2 | £500 | £560 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.64k | £1.36k | £1.16k | £889 | £101 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 02 February 2009 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 February 2008 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 26 February 2008 | 26 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 07 November 2007 | 280 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 November 2007 | 289 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 17 February 2006 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 23 March 2006 | 51 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECTED TO VIOLENCE BY PARTNERS OR EX-PARTNERS, AND OF CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY THEREOF WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECTED TO PHYSICAL ASSAULT MENTAL ABUSE OR RAPE OR MALTREATMENT BY DEPRIVATION HUMILIATION INTIMIDATION ISOLATION OR OTHER FORMS OF VIOLENT BEHAVIOUR AND TO PROMOTE THE SAFETY OF SUCH WOMEN AND THEIR PROTECTION FROM FURTHER VIOLENCE IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE IMPROVEMENT OF PROTECTION AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR SUCH WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN IN CALDERDALE
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window