Financial history PROJECT GEM

Charity number: 1090376
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2015 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019
Total gross income £3.53k £2.90k £10.00k £10.00k £15.00k
Total expenditure £3.58k £2.75k £6.00k £10.11k £9.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A