Financial history BRITISH SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY

Charity Number: 1084852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £288.58k £158.43k £238.89k £261.15k £0
Total expenditure £173.47k £159.96k £185.60k £160.86k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A