BRITISH SOCIETY OF INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in interventional radiology. Assisting with the provision of further facilities for education and research in interventional radiology
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 February 2001: Standard registration
- BSIR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ian James McCafferty MRCP FRCR | Chair | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr RAGHURAM LAKSHMINARAYAN | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Professor Robert Anthony Morgan | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Ram Kasthuri | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Professor Mo Hamady | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Philip John Haslam | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £288.58k | £158.43k | £238.89k | £261.15k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.47k | £159.96k | £185.60k | £160.86k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 April 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 April 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY AND THE PROVISION OF FURTHER FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN INTERVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BSIR Secretariat
63 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3JW
- Phone:
- 020 7406 599804
- Email:
- office@bsir.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window