BELIEVE TO ACHIEVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
B2A is a registered charity, has achieved national recognition since it was founded in 2002 for its work offering broad support to children, schools and families in need of help across Wolverhampton and surrounding boroughs. Activities include: After-school and lunchtime clubs, Curriculum activities, Parent Nuture Programme, Counselling, Mentoring, Peer Support & Holiday Activities.B2A
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Dudley
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 December 2000: Standard registration
- B2A (Working name)
- LISA POTTS CHILDREN'S TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA VICTORIA WEBB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE JOY HARRIS | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|||||
ROBERT HOWARD MARRIS | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Michelle Ann Moorhouse | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JON CROCKETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.28k | £156.89k | £188.34k | £238.11k | £165.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.42k | £148.28k | £169.82k | £218.75k | £186.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 DECEMBER 2000 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY THOSE AGED BETWEEN 7 AND 11 RESIDENT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH A PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON THROUGH PLAY, DRAMA, MUSIC, ART, DANCE, SPORT AND OUTDOOR PURSUITS SO THAT THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT MAY BE ENHANCED
Area of benefit
THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH A PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE BOROUGH OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELIEVE TO ACHIEVE
THE WORKSPACE
ALL SAINTS ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 1EL
- Phone:
- 01902877552
- Email:
- NICK.PRATT@LIVE.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window