BIG BUZZ AFTER SCHOOL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 27 June 2002: Standard registration
- 28 September 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BIG BUZZ (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.78k | £92.56k | £75.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.78k | £94.52k | £80.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 31 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 09 November 2007 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 09 November 2007 | 9 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 20 December 2006 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 27 October 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 AUGUST 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATIONAL, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window