THE SUPREME MASTER CHING HAI INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION (UK) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 2001: Standard registration
- 23 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMPASSIONATE ACTION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2004 | 29 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OF HOMELESS PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window