THE RYA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are: to provide or assist in the provision of facilities for recreation for disabled people; to promote and encourage recreational sailing by disabled people through co-ordination and integration with sailing clubs and associations. The trustees achieve this by undertaking fundraising activities and making appropriate grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 January 2001: Standard registration
- RYA SAILABILITY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie BLACHFORD | Chair | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Bibby | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Margaret Neylan | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Gunn | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Patricia Delany | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Phillips | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Sater | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.74k | £23.61k | £115.99k | £166.52k | £71.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.44k | £46.29k | £19.59k | £44.09k | £112.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN BOATING; AND/OR 1.1.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND/OR 1.1.3 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE BOATING BY INDIVIDUALS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES THROUGH COORDINATION AND INTEGRATION WITH THE EXISTING STRUCTURE OF ASSOCIATIONS, CLUBS AND THE RYA RECOGNISED TRAINING CENTRES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RYA HOUSE
ENSIGN WAY
HAMBLE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 4YA
- Phone:
- 02380604100
- Email:
- info@ryafoundation.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window