PRIMARY CARE CARDIOVASCULAR SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides primary care perspective on CVD management to policy makers and expert bodies Facilitates communication and the exchange of knowledge between clinical practitioners in primary care Promotes evidence-based approaches and best practice in the speciality of community cardiovascular disease. Provides education on prevention and management of cardiovascular disease
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2001: Standard registration
- 18 September 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.56k | £173.36k | £323.75k | £575.73k | £382.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.05k | £216.93k | £307.44k | £545.27k | £523.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £575.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £530.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 31 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 31 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 31 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 31 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 31 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 12TH OF OCTOBER 1999 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON THE 8TH OF SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE OF CARDIOVASCULAR PRIMARY CARE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND OF INFORMATION SO AS TO IMPROVE AND TO DEVELOP CARE AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WITH CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window