Financial history WALSALL URDU CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity Number: 1083075
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £3.14k £3.45k £5.89k £3.24k £3.24k
Total expenditure £4.19k £2.98k £4.95k £2.56k £2.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A