CHRISTIAN COMPASSION MINISTRIES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the charitable work of Christian Compassion Ministries Foundation Inc, Manila, in particular, but not exclusively, (1) The relief of povery, sickness and distress; (2) The preservation and protection of health; (3) The advancement of education; and (4) The advancement of religion. All for the benefit of the street children and indigent families of Manila, Philippines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Philippines
Governance
- 13 December 2000: Standard registration
- CCM (Working name)
- CCMUK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DAVID RELF | Chair |
|
||||||
Josh Townsend | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WALTER PINCHESS | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY PINCHESS | Trustee | 06 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Reddy Valdez Gonzales | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS BECKY ROSHANFEKR | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TIMOTHY SPARROW | Trustee | 23 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAT GOODRICH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACKIE GOOCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON BARBARA HEYWORTH BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN REGINALD LOVELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.13k | £180.08k | £140.99k | £128.72k | £365.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.32k | £186.72k | £138.95k | £136.17k | £294.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF CHRISTIAN COMPASSION MINISTRIES FOUNDATION INC., MANILA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY 1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH; 3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, ALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE STREET CHILDREN AND INDIGENT FAMILIES OF MANILA, PHILIPPINES, WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR RACE,COLOUR, CREED, RELIGION, ORIGIN, SEX OR PHYSICAL CONDITION.
Area of benefit
MANILA, PHILIPPINES
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 WOODLAND RISE
WELWYN GARDEN CITY
AL8 7LF
- Phone:
- 01707325345
- Email:
- info@ccmmanila.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window