THE GUISBOROUGH BRIDGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to provide care & support to the people of Guisborough & surrounding area by providing: FoodStop (a food bank); Youth and Children's clubs and initiatives; Guis Lunch Club - a weekly lunch for the elderly; Christmas Day Meal; Monday Friends; Soup & Roll lunches and Coffee mornings; Bridge2parents - supporting parents in their challenging job and an Elderly Exercise class & lunch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £726 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 01 May 2001: Standard registration
- THE BRIDGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Walker | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Ingrassia | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Joyce Sylvia East | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Gardner | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Harper Wells | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.82k | £152.64k | £71.88k | £102.45k | £122.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.04k | £86.34k | £78.02k | £89.88k | £121.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.31k | £7.25k | N/A | £726 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED 9 APRIL 2001, 09 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 18 OCTOBER 2010. as amended on 21 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GUISBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT),WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR RELIGION OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AGENCIES OF THE GOVERNMENT AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT THE ADVANCE OF EDUCATION, SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AVAILABLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO OPERATE IN ALIGNMENT WITH THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHURCHES TOGETHER IN GUISBOROUGH TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY.
Area of benefit
REDCAR + CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat A
58 Westgate
GUISBOROUGH
TS14 6AY
- Phone:
- 01287638771
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window