BASINGSTOKE GATEWAY AWARD PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working within the structure of the Gateway award the charity provides a leisure experience for people with a learning disability in partnership with Basingstoke Voluntary Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 January 2001: Standard registration
- 13 December 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1085576 BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SERVICES
- BASINGSTOKE GAP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.75k | £7.40k | £5.13k | £1.03k | £39 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £10.05k | £3.28k | £4.38k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 November 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE LOCALITY OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE SPECIFIC AIM OF INCLUDING PEOPLE OF ALL ABILITIES
Area of benefit
BASINGSTOKE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window