UNITED MISSION TO NEPAL HOSPITALS ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEALTH...SUPPORTING HOSPITALS AND HEALTH WORK IN NEPAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nepal
Governance
- 07 November 2000: Standard registration
- 01 April 2021: Funds received from 293585 THE WOODFORD WELLS ECUMENICAL CHURCH TRUST
- UMN HOSPITALS' ENDOWMENT TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Andrew Rodgers | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Ian Robert Chadwell | Trustee | 23 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Butterworth | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Anne Chevassut | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Trimble | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr GARY PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANTHONY CLEVE JONATHAN CHEVASSUT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.77k | £85.63k | £46.73k | £47.45k | £132.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.57k | £57.74k | £32.18k | £31.64k | £32.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE BUT IN PARTICULAR I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS; II) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION; III) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED;
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Langtang
Berry Lane
East Hanney
WANTAGE
OX12 0JB
- Phone:
- 07906066308
- Email:
- tim@umnhet.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window