FAMILY AND FRIENDS OF SANDGATE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils in the School by raising funds and providing facilities or equipment, in so far as the same are not officially funded by the Local Education Authority. To develop effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD LAWTON | Chair | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY BROWN | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Cannings | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MORNA FRANCES SIMS | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Daniel Hinton | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR ELIZABETH JOHNSON | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ROSE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £3.15k | £5.26k | £7.36k | £5.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £701 | £2.08k | £12.82k | £507 | £18.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 25TH SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY I) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; II) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SANDGATE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Rydal Road
LANCASTER
LA1 3HA
- Phone:
- 01524381405
- Email:
- FIONA.ARMSTRONG@EFT-POS.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window