Muddy Puddles Pre-School Long Ditton

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide childcare and early years education for children from 2 years to 5 with access to a garden area, outdoor facilities and forest walks. We are open 5 days per a week (30 hours per week), during school term times, following the EYFS curriculum and registered by OFSTED. All staff are fully qualified to the required childcare standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 November 2000: Standard registration
- STEPPING STONES PLAYGROUP (SURBITON) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Caplan | Chair | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Hari Jon | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Christian | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Priya Morgan | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.83k | £88.97k | £152.95k | £149.11k | £108.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.15k | £99.74k | £129.88k | £146.41k | £153.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 September 2020 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 September 2020 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 1 NOVEMBER 2000. as amended on 10 Jan 2019 as amended on 16 Jan 2020 as amended on 08 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SURBITON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Long Ditton Cricket Club
Betts Way
Long Ditton
SURBITON
KT6 5HT
- Phone:
- 07884348597
- Email:
- manager@muddypuddles.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window