Accounts and annual returns TORFAEN ENVIRONMENTAL TRUST

Charity number: 1089144
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 October 2024 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 May 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 December 2021 233 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required