Accounts and annual returns THE COTTAGE NURSERY (SHRIVENHAM STATION)
Charity Number: 1084207
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 05 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 06 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 28 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 06 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 01 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 01 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 26 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 13 May 2008 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window