THE COTTAGE NURSERY (SHRIVENHAM STATION)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cottage Nursery caters for children from the local communities of Shrivenham and Watchfield. It provides high quality child care for ages 3 months to pre-school working on a flexible session system, open from 0830 to 1800hrs, Monday to Friday, for 50 weeks of the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 December 2000: Standard registration
- 14 April 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 April 2011: Funds transferred to 1133631 THE COTTAGE NURSERY
- THE COTTAGE NURSERY (SHRIVENHAM) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £386.32k | £386.32k | £362.99k | £384.72k | £330.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.25k | £353.25k | £322.54k | £325.79k | £290.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 05 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 06 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 28 April 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 06 May 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 01 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 01 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 26 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 13 May 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED 17 NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS. TO BE A SAFE AND HAPPY PLACE, WHERE EVERYONE IS KNOWN AND VALUED AND WHERE ALL CHILDREN'S NEEDS ARE ACCEPTED AND MET. TO ENCOURAGE ALL PARENTS TO BE PARTNERS WITH US IN THE EDUCATION OF THEIR CHILDREN. TO ENSURE THAT ALL CHILDREN CAN FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL AND TO VALUE AND INCLUDE ALL ASPECTS OF CHILDREN'S LIVES. TO HELP CHILDREN DEVELOP INDEPENDENCE, SELF-DISCIPLINE, CONFIDENCE AND HIGH SELF-ESTEEM. TO HELP CHILDREN TO DEVELOP A SENSE OF RESPONSIBILITY FOR THEMSELVES, FOR OTHERS AND FOR THEIR ENVIRONMENT. TO PROVIDE AN ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH CHILDREN CAN LEARN EFFECTIVELY, THROUGH PLANNING, TEACHING AND EVALUATION, AND WITH CARING RELATIONSHIPS AND POSITIVE EXPERIENCES WHICH ENABLE CHILDREN TO PROGRESS THROUGH THIS STAGE OF THEIR LIVES AND ON TO THE NEXT STAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OXFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window