THE WOODLEY PRE-SCHOOL (READING)

Charity number: 1085356
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PRESCHOOL PROVIDES CARE AND LEARNING THROUGH PLAY EACH WEEKDAY MORNING FOR YOUNGSTERS AGED FROM 2.0 TO 5.0 YEARS WITHIN WALKING DISTANCE OF WOODLEY MAIN SHOPPING PRECINCT IN THE BOROUGH OF WOKINGHAM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015

Total income: £23,688
Total expenditure: £37,270

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 2001: Standard registration
  • 20 November 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 20 November 2017: Funds transferred to 1160756 THE WOODLEY PRE-SCHOOL (READING)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £80.49k £83.33k £45.22k £35.57k £23.69k
Total expenditure £65.74k £66.70k £55.04k £44.16k £37.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.95k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2014 23 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 23 June 2015 On Time