BRITISH DALMATIAN WELFARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS OF THE DALMATIAN BREED IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION; AND, IN PART, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF THE DALMATIANS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 2001: Standard registration
- BRITISH DALMATIAN WELFARE (Working name)
- THE DALMATIAN WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- THE DALMATION WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE GURNSEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sara Wendy Green | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jeffery William Brooks | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hopkin | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Brooks | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Elliott | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marion Wildey | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Maggi de Rozario | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANN BREDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON HIPKISS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.56k | £72.35k | £153.88k | £40.42k | £63.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.40k | £69.45k | £63.82k | £75.31k | £82.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED 4 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERINGS OF DOGS OF THE DALMATIAN BREED IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND,IN PARTICULAR,TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR RECEPTION,CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF DALMATIANS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farm Cottage
STUDLEY
Warwickshire
B80 7AH
- Phone:
- 01527854048
- Email:
- BDWsecretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window