Financial history THE DEER IN THE ENVIROMENT EDUCATIONAL RESOURCE FUND

Charity Number: 1084660
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £9.00k £10.08k £11.89k £8.29k £5.87k
Total expenditure £11.17k £9.24k £5.37k £12.71k £4.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A