Financial history SANDYMOOR (RUNCORN) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1083856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.19k £30.51k £27.36k £32.59k £22.65k
Total expenditure £27.30k £27.81k £17.78k £29.46k £28.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k N/A N/A N/A