STRATFORD-UPON-AVON U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and Leisure activities for older, or retired people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Audrey Theresa Bourniquel | Chair | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL ORSMAN | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Foster | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Eden | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Patricia Elliott | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Schofield | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Gullick | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/01/2021 | 12/01/2022 | 12/01/2023 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.69k | £1.69k | £4.32k | £6.24k | £12.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.89k | £1.89k | £5.28k | £1.10k | £11.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF THE MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT IN STRATFORD-UPON-AVON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Waterloo Drive
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwickshire
CV37 7HS
- Phone:
- 01789 551263
- Email:
- savu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window