KURDISH COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL SERVICES/ACTIVITIES FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 October 2000: Standard registration
- 13 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- KCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.07k | £74.86k | £37.08k | £96.66k | £35.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.78k | £71.82k | £36.70k | £96.63k | £75.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.40k | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 07 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 February 2018 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
02 February 2018 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 13 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 13 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 03 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 03 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR KURDISH PEOPLE AND REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS LIVING IN LONDON BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window