Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HAZEL WOOD

Charity Number: 1085343
Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/09/2018 18/09/2019 18/09/2020 18/09/2021 18/09/2022
Total gross income £18.68k £14.99k £9.77k £14.70k £5.74k
Total expenditure £25.80k £9.49k £17.19k £3.09k £7.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A