Trustees THE NEW LIFE INTERNATIONAL MISSION
Charity number: 1092682

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr Panton Okon | Chair | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Dickson Ojukwu | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Theophilus Chondol | Trustee | 18 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Obaigbona | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|||||
REV Danny Ansong | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Gloria N Edwards-Inatimi | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sename Ojukwu | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.