EMMANUEL CHRISTIAN CENTRE, PEMBROKESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"to advance the Christian faith primarily in the area of Pembrokeshire.." through Emmanuel Church and Annual Beach Missions (our Bookshop has ceased to trade.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Netherlands
Governance
- 21 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA ELIZABETH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
CORNELIS ANTOINE VAN DER SPOEL | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neale Gregson | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN GWYNFOR PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHANIE JANET PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.27k | £75.23k | £112.35k | £90.45k | £110.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.46k | £110.20k | £95.82k | £92.34k | £105.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 JUNE 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8 APRIL 2001 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13/1/13
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY IN THE AREA OF PEMBROKESHIRE AND SOUTH WALES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINE AND BASIS OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE FIRST SCHEDULE HERETO.
Area of benefit
PEMBROKESHIRE AND SOUTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 PEMBROKE ROAD
MERLINS BRIDGE
HAVERFORDWEST
PEMBS
SA61 1LN
- Phone:
- 01437767921
- Email:
- treasurer@eccentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window