BETTY LAYWARD SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PTFA to support the work of Betty Layward School and help fund projects, resources and equipment that enhance the children's educational experience and the school's facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 November 2000: Standard registration
- BETTY LAYWARD PTFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Akyeampong | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Regina Suarez Palacios | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Robson Mercer | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jorge Augusto Vergas Fidalgo Sardo | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Beck | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christin Holzer | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Luke Ciavarella | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Minoletti | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Burnett | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Bailey | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.92k | £57.46k | £3.48k | £14.01k | £69.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.70k | £31.96k | £54.87k | £1.87k | £40.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 May 2021 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 01 February 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY I) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; II) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
BETTY LAYWARD PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Betty Layward Primary School
Clissold Road
LONDON
N16 9EX
- Phone:
- 02072497111
- Email:
- bettyptfa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window