THE GRANT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is the policy of the Trust to make grants to institutions and individuals in accordance with the objects of the Trust for charitable causes from funds available for distribution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,080,484
Donations and legacies | £1.03m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £47.34k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,087,673
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.09m |
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Simon Grant | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARY PETER GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE ANN GRANT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DUNCAN PETER GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART GRANT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNA LUCY WARNER-MCLOUGHLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £590.00k | £30.00k | £100.00k | £1.20m | £1.08m | |
|
Total expenditure | £615.60k | £41.25k | £72.56k | £635.31k | £1.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £590.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.20m | £1.03m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £47.34k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £615.60k | N/A | N/A | £629.01k | £1.09m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.10k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £6.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £614.50k | N/A | N/A | £629.01k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £6.30k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £79.43k | N/A | N/A | £728.72k | £647.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £67.90k | N/A | N/A | £136.30k | £62.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 December 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO PAY APPLY OR ALLOCATE THEM TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH SHARES AND SUCH MANNER AS THEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 2) NOTWITHSTANDING THE GENERALITY OF SUB CLAUSE 4.1 THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND SPECIFICALLY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS WITHIN OR OUTSIDE GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND: - 2.1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BEING EVANGELICAL IN NATURE; 2.2) ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS WHOSE PROVISION OFFERS HOPE TO SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; 2.3) ASSISTING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED TO RECEIVE SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO BETTER LIVES; 3) IN DECIDING WHETHER OR NOT TO EXERCISE THIS POWER THE TRUSTEES SHALL BE ENTITLED TO REGARD ONLY THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES AND TO DISREGARD THE INTERESTS OF ALL OTHER CHARITIES WHICH MIGHT OTHERWISE HAVE BENEFITED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICEWORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haddon House
38 High Street
AMERSHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP7 0DJ
- Phone:
- 01494 737037
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window