ORGANISATION OF HIV POSITIVE AFRICAN MEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Workshops and Seminars, Positive Speakers, Support Group Meetings, Health Promotion Events Volunteering Opportunities and Social events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 May 2001: Standard registration
- OPAM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanuel Annan | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Cloudio Masangomai | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Bockarie | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ayub Edward Ibrahim | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Magonde | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.68k | £13 | £9.00k | £0 | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.35k | £5.24k | £11.00k | £6.90k | £4.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2024 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST AFRICAN MEN AND THEIR FAMILIES AFFECTED AND INFECTED BY HIV/AIDS, PARTICULARLY IN THE PROVISION OF CULTURALLY SENSITIVE SERVICES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Tamworth Road
West Croydon
Croydon
Surrey
London
CR0 1XU
- Phone:
- 02086849316
- Email:
- opam.org@btconnect.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window