FRANCIS HASKELL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to scholars, mainly to fund travel to countries other than their own, to pursue art-historical research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silvia Davoli | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stammers | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Avery-Quash | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Nicoll | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLES ARCHIBALD HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE MARY ELAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR NICHOLAS BEAVER PENNY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £109 | £225 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.15k | £0 | £9.62k | £9.62k | £7.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2025 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 20TH JULY 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF ART AND RELATED SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Wilmington Square
LONDON
WC1X 0ET
- Phone:
- 02076848370
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
francishaskellmemorialfund.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window