Accounts and annual returns A GLIMMER OF HOPE (UK)

Charity Number: 1084735
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 13 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 30 November 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 21 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 06 November 2008 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 25 November 2008 25 days late