Financial history A GLIMMER OF HOPE (UK)

Charity Number: 1084735
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £335.72k £314.50k £318.37k £342.43k £14.42k
Total expenditure £229.46k £248.82k £333.55k £378.14k £409.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A