Financial history CHARISMATIC RENEWAL MINISTRIES (CRM) UK

Charity Number: 1088522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.80k £37.98k £60.12k £63.60k £69.60k
Total expenditure £28.79k £20.84k £32.20k £75.94k £62.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A