Financial history Friends of St Paul’s Cray CE Primary School

Charity number: 1084151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.49k £2.40k £922 £1.88k £2.50k
Total expenditure £6.68k £3.36k £4.06k £1.71k £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A