STANLEY HOUSE ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football, Fitness and multi sports
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 20 September 2001: Standard registration
- KINGSLEY FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- STANLEY HOUSE FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EARL JENKINS | Chair |
|
||||||
Frederick Alfred Jones | Trustee | 29 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aubrey Peter Rogers | Trustee | 16 February 2002 |
|
|
||||
JUSTINE RONA JENKINS-BURKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.81k | £3.27k | £8.96k | £522 | £58.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £6.65k | £6.11k | £5.30k | £11.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 849 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 June 2021 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY MAY ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE. 2) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A PERMANENT BASE - THE ACADEMY AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. 3) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINE.,
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kingsley United
49 Dove Street
Toxteth
Liverpool
L8 0TU
- Phone:
- 01517095153
- Email:
- kingsleyunited@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window