COBALT HEALTH

Charity number: 1090790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity works, in collaboration with the National Health Service and other bodies, to prevent, detect, diagnose and treat or alleviate cancers and other life limiting disease/injury. It does this by providing: 1) funding to support local NHS oncological and allied services 2) a Cancer Prevention and Education Service 3) an MRI scanning service 4) a PET-CT service 5) funding of research

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COBALT (Working name)
  • COBALT APPEAL FUND (Working name)
  • GLOUCESTERSHIRE MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SERVICE (Working name)
  • COBALT UNIT APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip James Leonard Chair 16 November 2023
None on record
Prof Gordon Keith Wilcock Trustee 09 January 2024
None on record
Dr Felicity Jenkins Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Matthew Nicholas Jones Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Claire Morris Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Pamela Sissons Trustee 23 June 2022
None on record
Ruth Elaine Goddard Trustee 24 February 2020
DOGS FOR GOOD
Received: On time
Dr Valerie Jane Udale Trustee 24 February 2020
None on record
Dr Janet Ropner Trustee 28 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.75m £21.67m £22.88m £26.84m £25.36m
Total expenditure £12.82m £14.87m £19.95m £25.93m £26.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £83.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.09m £929.61k £464.72k £987.02k £553.05k
Income - Other trading activities £427.64k £84.61k £359.16k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £11.98m £20.26m £21.93m £25.67m £24.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.25k £10.45k £13.51k £67.20k £161.14k
Income - Other £209.24k £387.29k £112.20k £114.05k £123.22k
Income - Legacies £947.48k £811.34k £297.57k £664.01k £334.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.45m £14.59m £19.66m £25.58m £26.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £363.97k £281.36k £292.30k £345.06k £344.94k
Expenditure - Governance £14.10k £14.10k £14.10k £18.20k £19.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £17.18m £19.95m £22.90m £25.40m £24.24m
Long-term investments £150.00k £150.00k £150.00k £150.00k £150.00k
Other assets £8.13m £12.97m £12.96m £12.24m £11.07m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.68m £3.48m £3.49m £4.36m £3.59m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JULY 1988 AND SUBJECT TO A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER SECTION 96 (5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 27 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF CANCER IN PERSONS LIVING IN THE COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE BY MEANS OF A COBALT UNIT AND SUCH OTHER PREVENTION DETECTION AND TREATMENT AS MAY BE FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDED BY THE TRUSTEES INCLUDING THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF EQUIPMENT, AND AMENITIES TO PATIENTS LIVING IN THE SAID AREA OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE HEREFORDSHIRE SOUTH WORCESTERSHIRE
Registration history
  • 03 June 2003 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Cobalt Health
Linton House Clinic
Thirlestaine Road
CHELTENHAM
GL53 7AS
Phone:
01242535906