Trustees CHARITIES INTERNAL AUDIT NETWORK
Charity number: 1087283
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
laura kemp | Chair | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenia Islentsyeva | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Barraclough | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Garry John Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
sue davis | Trustee | 05 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Scott | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Auguste | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.