Financial history USMANI MOSQUE

Charity Number: 1089411
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £372.58k £204.04k £386.29k £229.11k £206.27k
Total expenditure £126.64k £126.33k £140.92k £156.87k £167.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £41.49k N/A N/A N/A