USMANI MOSQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of Usmani Mosque in the year under review were those of the registered charity and its principal object remain to provide after-school Islamic education for 7-16 years old in accordance with Sunni Muslim faith and to provide a facility where Muslims can worship. .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 20 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANWAR WALI AHMED PATEL | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GAFUR HASAN PATEL | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Iqbal Gulamali Patel | Trustee | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAJID HASAN PATEL | Trustee | 04 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
SAJID IBRAHIM ALI | Trustee | 04 February 2007 |
|
|||||
ANASBABA IBRAHIM ISMAIL | Trustee | 04 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
MUSSA AHMED ALI | Trustee | 04 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
IQBAL UMARJI MODI | Trustee | 04 February 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £372.58k | £204.04k | £386.29k | £229.11k | £206.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.64k | £126.33k | £140.92k | £156.87k | £167.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 18 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED ON 15 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ISLAM AND SPREAD THE MESSAGE OF THE HOLY QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE HOLY PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSING OF ALLAH BE UPON HIM) IN ACCORDANCE TO THE DOCTRINE DEFINED HEREINABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Gwendolen Road
LEICESTER
LE5 5FE
- Phone:
- 07886127683
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window