Financial history ILOIS SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1087561
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2004 30/04/2005 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008
Total gross income £22.42k £16.57k £798 £128 £274
Total expenditure £24.62k £7.93k £6.58k £12.17k £288
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A