ILOIS SUPPORT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Capacity building of the chagossian community in Mauritius/Seychelles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Mauritius
- Seychelles
Governance
- 16 July 2001: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.42k | £16.57k | £798 | £128 | £274 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.62k | £7.93k | £6.58k | £12.17k | £288 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 16 March 2009 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 28 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 2000, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3RD JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME, AND MAY AT THEIR DISCRETION APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL, OF THE TRUST FUND FOR THE WELFARE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND CULTURAL RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF THE ILOIS. 11. THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT ASSISTANCE TO THE ILOIS THROUGH THE AGENCY OF OTHER CHARITIES. 111. IN CARRYING OUT THE TRUSTS DECLARED BY THIS DEED THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE SPECIAL REGARD TO THE LONG TERM WELFARE OF THE ILOIS COMMUNITY WHETHER IN THEIR COUNTRY OF THEIR PRESENT RESIDENCE OR IN THE CHAGOS ARCHIPELAGO.
Area of benefit
INDIAN OCEAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window