BRIAN AND JILL MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To make donations to registered Charitable Organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Jane Levy | Trustee | 03 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MOSS DR | Trustee | 03 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
JILL MOSS | Trustee | 21 August 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.70k | £193.43k | £187.63k | £235.80k | £250.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.29k | £210.05k | £230.78k | £215.79k | £253.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF: - SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES; AND/OR SUCH REGISTERED CHARITIES FOR THEIR WORK IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT; AND 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ADDITION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deloitte Llp
5 Callaghan Square
Cardiff
CF10 5BT
- Phone:
- 02920264388
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window