OLDHAM MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The team is a voluntary organisation whose objective is to save life and alleviate distress, primarily in upland and mountain areas without cost or obligation. The team also helps the emergency services with search and rescue activities in areas and conditions where they may not have adequate, resources, experience or where our specialist skills are required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 10 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Jones | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Johnson | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Fitton | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helena Skinn | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Atherton | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean Richard Reade | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Wyatt | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.99k | £59.08k | £57.10k | £92.36k | £32.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.81k | £46.96k | £63.62k | £42.67k | £53.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.18k | £22.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 14 MAR 2022 as amended on 05 Jan 2023 as amended on 05 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are to save life and relieve suffering and distress amongst any persons affected by accidents or natural hazards in the area of Greater Manchester and elsewhere ("the area of benefit") and in furtherance of the above, but not further or otherwise: (1) To provide search, rescue and first aid facilities, equipment and manpower within the area of benefit; (2) To provide association between persons interested in mountain and moorland rescue; (3) To provide facilities to train persons in the skills of mountain and moorland rescue.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 19
Boarshurst Business Park
Boarshurst Lane
Greenfield
Greater Manchester
OL3 7ER
- Phone:
- 01457873098
- Email:
- admin@omrt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window