FRIENDS OF SOMER VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arrange 2/3 Health Forums a year. Raise money to purchase extra equipment and facilities for Chilcompton, St Chad's and Somerton House surgeries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 17 November 2000: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CHILCOMPTON AND ST CHADS SURGERIES (Previous name)
- ST CHADS PATIENT PARTICIPATION GROUP (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ST.CHAD'S AND CHILCOMPTON SURGERIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Mary Evans | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Dawson | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/06/2020 | 22/06/2021 | 22/06/2022 | 22/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £3.79k | £5.07k | £4.83k | £4.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £2.28k | £3.79k | £4.33k | £6.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 June 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 22 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/07/1998 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 10 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2024 AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
A. TO RELIEVE SUFFERING BY FOSTERING AND IMPROVING COMMUNICATION BETWEEN THE PATIENTS OF SOMER VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP SURGERIES, MIDSOMER NORTON AND THOSE PROVIDING A SERVICE FROM THE SURGERIES. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GROUP MEMBERSHIP IN HEALTH CARE ISSUES BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORUMS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. C. TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURCHASE AND MAINTENANCE OF MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT FOR SOMER VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP SURGERIES, MIDSOMER NORTON NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY. THE GROUP SHALL ENSURE PERIODIC REVIEW OF ITS AIMS WITH APPROPRIATE CONSIDERATION OF THE EVOLVING NEEDS OF PATIENTS OF SOMER VALLEY MEDICAL GROUP SURGERIES, MIDSOMER NORTON AND SERVICE PROVIDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMBLESIDE
MONGER LANE
MIDSOMER NORTON
RADSTOCK
BA3 2SP
- Phone:
- 01761414438
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window