BEYOND IMAGINATION MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide groups that allows an open forum for faith development. Training for ministers, spiritual healers/reiki practitioners. Groups for meditation, young persons work and an internet presence on social networking sites. We also support smaller charities and groups with guidance and advice on faith matters and some small financial assistance/finding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Powys
Governance
- 12 February 2002: Standard registration
- BEYOND IMAGINATION MINISTRIES UK (Working name)
- BIM NEW EARTH TRADITION (Working name)
- BIM UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Damieon Cunningham | Chair | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anghard Ford | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £510 | £434 | £185 | £0 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £270 | £267 | £0 | £105 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JANUARY 2002. as amended on 26 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFICIENT APPLICATION OF RESOURCES BY NON-CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND FAITH GROUPS AND INTER FAITH GROUPS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE TO TRUSTEES, STAFF AND VOLUNTEERS OF SUCH ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Vivian Street
ABERTILLERY
Gwent
NP13 2LF
- Phone:
- 07541714080
- Email:
- damieon.bim@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window