READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The carrying on or managing of schools for boys and girls under the age of 19, in which religious instruction, in accordance with the doctrines of the Church of England, shall be given.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£16,536,863
Donations and legacies | £190.92k | |
Charitable activities | £16.09m | |
Other trading activities | £254.82k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£16,197,294
Raising funds | £81.52k | |
Charitable activities | £16.12m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £81.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.12m | |
Retained for future use | £339.57k |
People

208 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 10 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
Governance
- 02 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jo Anna Reed Johnson | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hallowell | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Hartshorn | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Sheena Taylor | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Roberts | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anjali Chandar | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Freeman | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Rumbelow | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Colpus | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael David Etherington | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Howard Williams | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|||||
LOUISE ELAINE HAGUE | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12m | £12.65m | £13.83m | £15.69m | £16.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.19m | £12.09m | £13.01m | £14.06m | £16.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £253.30k | £461.74k | £247.81k | £481.38k | £190.92k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £232.29k | £129.87k | £20.46k | £219.54k | £254.82k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.63m | £12.06m | £13.52m | £14.99m | £16.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £6.55k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £41.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.03m | £11.97m | £12.92m | £13.98m | £16.12m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £158.53k | £122.43k | £88.88k | £81.76k | £81.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.16k | £18.95k | £19.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £19.40m | £20.24m | £19.65m | £20.07m | £21.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2 | £2 | |
|
Other assets | £1.95m | £2.86m | £4.11m | £4.27m | £3.78m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.85m | £6.03m | £5.88m | £4.98m | £5.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JUNE 2001 as amended on 27 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 The Charity's objects are: 2.1.1 the advancement of education by carrying on or managing schools for boys, girls and young people under the age of 25 years in which religious instruction in accordance with the teachings of the Church of England shall be given; 2.1.2 to apply income not required for the maintenance of the schools carried or managed by the Charity in any one or more of the following ways for the benefit of persons who have not yet attained the age of 25 years who are about to attend or are attending, or have for not less than three years at any time attended Reading Blue Coat School at Holme Park, Sonning on Thames, Berkshire RG4 6SU, referred to in these articles as ‘the School’ and who, in the opinion of the Governors are in need of financial assistance: 2.1.2.1 the award of scholarships, bursaries or maintenance allowances tenable at the School, or any university, or other place of learning approved by the Governors; 2.1.2.2 the provision of financial assistance, outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books to help beneficiaries on leaving the School, a university or any other educational establishment to prepare for, or to enter, a profession, trade or calling; 2.1.2.3 the award of scholarships or maintenance allowances to enable beneficiaries to travel abroad to pursue their education; 2.1.2.4 the provision, or assistance towards the provision, of facilities for recreation and social and physical training, including the provision of coaching in athletics, sport and games, for beneficiaries; and 2.1.2.5 the provision of financial assistance to enable beneficiaries to study music or other arts provided that there shall be maintained in the School six scholarships, comprising total or partial remission of tuition, to persons found fit for admission to the School, all of whom shall be resident within 40 miles (in a straight line) of the School. 2.2 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with any statutory provision regarding the meaning of the word "charitable" or the words "charitable purposes" in force in any part of the United Kingdom.
Area of benefit
READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRS A WEST
HOLME PARK
SONNING LANE
SONNING
READING
RG4 6SU
- Phone:
- 01189335808
- Email:
- bursar@rbcs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window