BARNET AFTER SCHOOL PLAYSCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides affordable after school and school holiday childcare for children aged 5 to 11 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 14 November 2000: Standard registration
- 22 November 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BASP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.04k | £40.42k | £48.80k | £38.96k | £39.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.23k | £40.48k | £45.27k | £36.76k | £40.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 May 2012 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 09 May 2012 | 99 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 09 May 2012 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 15 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 12 March 2010 | 40 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15TH MAY 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE AN AFTER SCHOOL PLAYSCHEME FOR CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 11 IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET (B) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE AND RECREATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 11 IN THE ARE OF BENEFIT DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window