FERN HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Further the education of primary school pupils by various means, including: 1. Developing more extended relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school. 2. Engaging in activities which support the school 3. Providing, and assisting in the provision of facilities or items for education at the school (not provided from statutory funds).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £45,643
Total expenditure: £51,810

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FERN HILL PSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Ramsey Chair 11 July 2024
None on record
Hannah Boyer Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Angelika Alani Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £41.77k £16.45k £6.78k £40.90k £45.64k
Total expenditure £39.87k £13.14k £27.33k £16.70k £51.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 October 2019 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FERN HILL PRIMARY SCHOOL
RICHMOND ROAD
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 5PE
Phone:
02082470300